U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00011-6
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BARROW et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 05, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • March 21, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • May 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
April, 2021
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • April 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.