U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00010-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOTT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 02, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
April, 2021
  • April 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.