U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LOWE
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.