U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00009-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ROBERTS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
January, 2022
  • January 10, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Judgment]
April, 2021
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.