U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00012-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ATKINS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.