U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00004-1
  • Case Name: USA v. NIX, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Plea of Guilty]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 17, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
May, 2021
  • May 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
April, 2021
  • April 30, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • April 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.