U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00027-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SILMAN et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 09, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • April 08, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 20, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • April 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.