U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00017-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. DOWDELL
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • March 21, 2025: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • March 21, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2022
  • May 13, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order]
  • January 27, 2022: [Order]
  • January 19, 2022: [Order]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Speedy Trial]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.