U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00019-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PETERS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2021
  • August 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.