U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00020-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MAYO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • May 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.