U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00021-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. FORD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.