U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00002-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PEREZ-MOLINA
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 17, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.