U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00026-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. REMSEN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Order]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion for Voir Dire Policy]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Quash]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • November 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.