U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:20-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SUTTON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.