U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00038-3
  • Case Name: USA v. BLACKSHEAR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • June 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.