U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00014-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. PORTIVENT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.