U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00028-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRYANT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 25, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • June 23, 2021: [Order]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.