U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-mj-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SOTO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.