U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00026-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. JOHNSON et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.