U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MANN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order for Forfeiture of Property]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.