U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00030-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TANNER et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2021
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • July 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.