U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00032-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HOLLOWAY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 10, 2025: [Order on Sentence Reduction - USSC Amendment - Amendment 821]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 23, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
September, 2021
  • September 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
August, 2021
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 24, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.