U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. MAPP
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.