U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00018-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GIDDENS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
September, 2021
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 16, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.