U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARRETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 23, 2025: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.