U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00031-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DEMPS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 07, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order to Extend Designation Date]
  • July 06, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Repayment Agreement and Order]
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 14, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • June 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 03, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 02, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
March, 2022
  • March 08, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 24, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • August 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 18, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.