U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00050-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. HUNT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 29, 2024: [Report and Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.