U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00035-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ARNOLD et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 06, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2021
  • August 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 20, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.