U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00049-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BASLEY
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 03, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order]
  • August 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • August 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.