U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00015-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. LIN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Protective Order]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 31, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • August 31, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.