U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00032-3
  • Case Name: USA v. VARAZO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Amended Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Petition for Action on Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Sever Defendant]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 21, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 18, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.