U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00038-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. CALLAHAN
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 10, 2022: [Order]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Order on Motion for Additional Decrease for Acceptance of Responsibility]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.