U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00029-4
  • Case Name: USA v. MATHIS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion in Limine]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Joint Motion]
  • July 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • September 29, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order]
  • September 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • September 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • September 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.