U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOGGERTY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: [Order]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
March, 2025
  • March 11, 2025: [Order]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 30, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order to Show Cause]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • September 19, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Objection]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
  • June 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to File Additional Motions]
  • June 08, 2022: [Order]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Adopt]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • October 13, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Declare Case Complex]
  • October 08, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 05, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 04, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.