U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PIETT
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2025
  • January 07, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 07, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.