U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00027-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order for Response to 2255 Motion]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 11, 2022: [Order]
  • March 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 03, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • October 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.