U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00033-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SNOW
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.