U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00042-2
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. WILLIAMS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 10, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.