U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00044-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MORRIS
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 24, 2025: [Order Appointing Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order of Commitment]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.