U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00041-2
  • Case Name: USA v. JOE BREWER, FRANK SETTAMBRINO
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order to Surrender]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • October 25, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.