U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00057-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. TAYLOR et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 02, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 27, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.