U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:21-cr-00037-3
  • Case Name: USA v. SEALED
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: [Amended Judgment/Revocation Judgment]
October, 2024
  • October 01, 2024: [Judgment]
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 05, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 05, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 01, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 01, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 02, 2022: [Judgment]
May, 2022
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 08, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.