U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00030-1
  • Case Name: USA v. KINNEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 15, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 15, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.