U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: USA v. ROSS et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Recusal]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 13, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order of Detention]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Seal Document]
  • January 05, 2023: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Medical Treatment]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 23, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • November 18, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.