U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00055-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SIMPSON
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • December 01, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order Modifying Conditions of Pretrial Release]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.