U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00039-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. BRIDGES et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Order]
April, 2022
  • April 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • March 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • March 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Release/Detention Order i/c/w 18 USC 3145]
  • February 02, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 28, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.