U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:21-cr-00048-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ARZATE et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 09, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Order of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.