U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00036-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. GOSIER
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Order]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 09, 2021: [Order]
  • December 07, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 06, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.