U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-00063-1
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. RILEY et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Ex Parte Motion]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • January 25, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Order]
  • February 03, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • February 01, 2022: [Protective Order]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • January 26, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • January 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • December 16, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2021: [Order Appointing Counsel]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.