U.S. Criminal Court Records for the Middle District of Georgia

georgia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the Middle District of Georgia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 7:21-cr-00053-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WERTS, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • February 28, 2022: [Order of Detention]
  • February 28, 2022: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue Trial in the Interests of Justice]
  • February 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Standard Pretrial Order]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 17, 2021: [Standard Rule 5 Order]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.